Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00301-CR    
02-17-00301-CR
10/03/2017
Assault
Bryan Keith Hernandez 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/19/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
02/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
01/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/04/2018Mandate issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
08/21/2018Case returned from higher court 
07/25/2018Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
06/05/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
06/04/2018Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
05/24/2018Memorandum opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
05/22/2018Submitted 
05/01/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/30/2018Letter issued by the court 
03/19/2018Reply brief filed 
02/27/2018Case ready to be set 
02/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/27/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/27/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/17/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/03/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/04/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hernandez, Bryan KeithCriminal - AppellantElizabeth Cortright
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasEdward D. Lewallen
Don Schnebly
Trial Court Information
43rd District Court 
Parker 
Honorable Craig Towson 
CR16-0892 
Court Reporter, 43rd District Court, Parker County 
20 Yrs. IDTDCJ $5,000 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site