Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00298-CR    
02-17-00298-CR
09/26/2017
Criminal Mischief - Electric
Aaron Amberson 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
05/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2018Submitted 
07/25/2018Motion to reset oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/23/2018Motion to reset oral argument filed 
07/23/2018Letter received 
07/18/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
07/17/2018Case ready to be set 
07/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/09/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/30/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/17/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
10/02/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/26/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCatherine Luft
Amberson, AaronCriminal - AppellantBrian Salvant
Adam L. Arrington
Trial Court Information
16th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Sherry Shipman 
F17-1973-16 
Court Reporter, 16th District Court 
10 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site