Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00295-CR    
02-17-00295-CR
09/25/2017
Burglary of a Habitation
David Thames a/k/a David Thomas 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/20/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
05/31/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
04/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/11/2018Submitted 
07/03/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
06/20/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
06/01/2018Letter filed 
05/31/2018Case ready to be set 
05/31/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/23/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
04/23/2018Letter received 
04/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/15/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/17/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/16/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/16/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
10/05/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/25/2017Order received from trial court 
09/25/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/11/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCatherine Luft
Lara Tomlin
Thames, David A/K/A David ThomasCriminal - AppellantJames Christopher Abel
Trial Court Information
158th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Steve Burgess 
F15-1315-158 
Court Reporter, 158th District Court 
60 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site