Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00293-CV    
02-17-00293-CV
08/30/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Dunn Law Group, P.C. 
M. Monique Walters 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/24/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
09/19/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
09/19/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/30/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/12/2018Case ready to be set 
07/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/02/2018Motion to substitute attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/30/2018Motion to substitute attorney filed 
04/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/05/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/04/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/07/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/02/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
01/09/2018Letter received 
01/09/2018Reporters record due 
12/27/2017Letter received 
12/12/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
10/27/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/30/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/30/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Walters,  , M. MoniqueAppelleeJerry J. Jarzombek
Dunn Law Group, P.C.AppellantThomas F. Dunn
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Don Pierson 
2015-001211-1 
Court Reporter, County Court At Law No. 1 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site