Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00283-CR    
02-17-00283-CR
09/07/2017
Poss With Intent to Deliver a Controlled Substance
Jose Ciro Rodriguez, Sr. 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/01/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
02/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/01/2018Case ready to be set 
03/01/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/27/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/23/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/21/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/07/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rodriguez, Senior, Jose CiroCriminal - AppellantLeigh W. Davis
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Landon Wade
Trial Court Information
432nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Ruben Gonzalez 
1297707D 
Court Reporter, 432nd District Court  
16 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site