Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00282-CV    
02-17-00282-CV
08/18/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Leticia C. Garcia 
Preston R. Ennis 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/29/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
01/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
10/11/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/06/2018Mandate issuedReversed and Remanded
06/28/2018Opinion issuedReversed and rendered & rev. and remanded
06/05/2018Submitted 
05/15/2018Set for submission on briefs 
01/29/2018Reply brief filed 
01/12/2018Motion to substitute attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/10/2018Case ready to be set 
01/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/08/2018Motion to substitute attorney filed 
11/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/11/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/11/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/31/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/28/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
08/18/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/06/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Garcia, Leticia C.AppellantGregory R. Ave
Ennis, Preston R.AppelleeLesley Holloway
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Don Pierson 
2014-002225-1-A 
Court Reporter, County Court At Law No. 1 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site