Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00282-CR    
02-17-00282-CR
09/07/2017
Assault
Blake Aaron Byers 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/18/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
03/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/18/2018Case ready to be set 
04/18/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/20/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/11/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/27/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/07/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
John E. Meskunas
Byers, Blake AaronCriminal - AppellantRay Napolitan
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 5 
Tarrant 
Honorable Jamie Graves Cummings 
1467332 
Court Reporter, County Criminal Court No. 5 
270 Days Tarrant County Jail $3000 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site