Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00279-CR    
02-17-00279-CR
09/01/2017
Capital Murder
Clarence David Mallory, Jr. 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/01/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/18/2018Submitted 
08/09/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
08/01/2018Case ready to be set 
08/01/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/11/2018Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/10/2018Motion for leave filed 
03/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/23/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/25/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/24/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
01/03/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/02/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
12/22/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/07/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/01/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Steven W. Conder
Mallory, Junior, Clarence DavidCriminal - AppellantJ. Warren St. John
Trial Court Information
297th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David C. Hagerman 
1395156D 
Court Reporter, 297th District Court 
Ct. 1 Life Without Parole IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site