Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00278-CR    
02-17-00278-CR
09/01/2017
Continuous Sexual Abuse of Young Child or Children
Bobby Lee Harris 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
03/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/2018Case returned from higher court 
09/12/2018Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
07/20/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
07/16/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
07/11/2018Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
06/28/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
06/22/2018Submitted 
06/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/28/2018Case ready to be set 
03/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/02/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/22/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
12/20/2017Order received from trial court 
12/19/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/19/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/18/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/18/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/01/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/18/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasLandon Wade
Joseph W. Spence
Harris, Bobby LeeCriminal - AppellantAbe Factor
Trial Court Information
371st District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Mollee Westfall 
1496615R 
Court Reporter, 371st District Court 
Ct. 1 30 Yrs. Ct. 2 5 Yrs. Ct. 4 2 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site