Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00277-CR    
02-17-00277-CR
09/01/2017
Continuous Sexual Abuse of Young Child or Children
Chance William Moore 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
03/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/17/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
04/25/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
04/19/2018Case ready to be set 
04/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/20/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/15/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/21/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
09/07/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/01/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Moore, Chance WilliamCriminal - AppellantBrian Salvant
Adam L. Arrington
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn E. Meskunas
Joseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
371st District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Mollee Westfall 
1464825D 
Court Reporter, 371st District Court 
Ct.1 40 Yrs. Ct. 5 10 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site