Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00275-CV    
02-17-00275-CV
08/11/2017
Divorce
David Christopher McCoy 
Lorna Scott McCoy 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
02/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/15/2018Memorandum opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/22/2018Submitted 
08/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/21/2018Case ready to be set 
03/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/25/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/04/2017Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/27/2017Response filed 
11/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/16/2017Response requested by the court 
10/31/2017Motion to dismiss filed 
10/19/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/18/2017Clerks record due 
09/13/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/13/2017Objection to mediation disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/2017Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
09/08/2017Mediation objection filed 
08/31/2017Deadline for parties to select mediator 
08/25/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/18/2017Appearance of counsel 
08/11/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/14/2019StatusRelease to publisher
01/24/2019StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
McCoy, Lorna ScottAppelleeDavid R. Sweat
David T. Kulesz
McCoy, David ChristopherAppellantChrissy R. Tefera
Trial Court Information
324th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Jerome S. Hennigan 
324-607511-16 
Court Reporter, 324th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site