Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00273-CR    
02-17-00273-CR
08/28/2017
Appeal From a Pretrial Order
The State of Texas 
Daniel Dewain Drury 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
12/15/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
02/05/2018Case ready to be set 
02/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/15/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/24/2017Appearance of counsel 
10/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/17/2017Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
10/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/11/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
09/15/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/05/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/31/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/28/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Drury, Daniel DewainAppelleeFrank D. Trotter
Benjamin E. Hoover
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJennifer Ponder
Maureen Shelton
Trial Court Information
30th District Court 
Wichita 
Honorable Robert P. Brotherton 
58190-A 
Court Reporter, 30th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site