Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00270-CR    
02-17-00270-CR
08/24/2017
Burglary of a Habitation
Ricky Zane Johnson 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/06/2018Case ready to be set 
06/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/2018Certificate of conference filed 
02/21/2018Certificate of conference filed 
02/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/05/2018Notice of late brief 
01/17/2018Notice of late brief 
11/27/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/27/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/26/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/28/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/25/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/04/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/24/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn D. Warren
Eric Erlandson
Johnson, Ricky ZaneCriminal - AppellantEmma Guzman Ramon
Trial Court Information
235th District Court 
Cooke 
Honorable Janelle M. Haverkamp 
CR16-00490 
Court Reporter, 235th District Court 
15 Yrs IDTDCJ, $2,500 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site