Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00269-CR    
02-17-00269-CR
08/22/2017
Murder
Taajon Jabri Richardson 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/29/2017Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/13/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
08/31/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
08/17/2018Exhibits filed 
08/15/2018Order entered 
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
02/09/2018Case ready to be set 
02/08/2018Response filed 
02/05/2018Pro Se response filed 
12/21/2017Letter issued by the court 
12/20/2017Letter filed 
12/19/2017Letter received 
12/11/2017Motion to access appellate record dispMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/2017Motion to access appellate record filed 
11/29/2017Letter issued by the court 
11/29/2017Letter received 
11/29/2017Anders brief filed 
11/29/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
11/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/10/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/10/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/25/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/22/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/15/2018StatusRelease to publisher
10/25/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Richardson, Taajon JabriCriminal - AppellantTaajon Jabri Richardson
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
396th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable George William Gallagher 
1503236R 
Court Reporter, 396th District Court 
15 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site