Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00266-CV    
02-17-00266-CV
08/09/2017
Motion to Transfer Venue
Dale Roy Slaven 
Brad Livingston, William Stephens, and Lynn M. Clark 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
01/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/04/2018Appearance of counsel 
09/13/2018Letter received 
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/20/2018Affidavit filed 
04/04/2018Letter issued by the court 
03/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
02/16/2018Case ready to be set 
02/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/17/2017Motion to substitute party disposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/13/2017Response filed 
11/10/2017Response requested by the court 
10/18/2017Response requested by the court 
10/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/11/2017Motion to access appellate record dispMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/2017Motion to access appellate record filed 
10/06/2017Motion to substitute party filed 
10/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/12/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/11/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/05/2017Notice of late docketing statement 
08/16/2017Notification received that no record was taken 
08/09/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
08/09/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Slaven, Dale RoyAppellantDale Roy Slaven
Clark, Lynn M.AppelleePenny Maley
Livingston, BradAppelleePenny Maley
Stephens, WilliamAppelleePenny Maley
Trial Court Information
30th District Court 
Wichita 
Honorable Robert P. Brotherton 
184,311-A 
Court Reporter, 30th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site