Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00264-CR    
02-17-00264-CR
08/22/2017
Assault
Joseph McDonald 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
01/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/08/2018Case ready to be set 
03/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/01/2018Letter filed 
01/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/04/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/22/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/06/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/25/2017Appearance of counsel 
08/22/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
McDonald, Joseph Criminal - AppellantGrace M. Wren
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCatherine Luft
Andrea Simmons
Trial Court Information
431st District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Jonathan M. Bailey 
F17-938-431 
Court Reporter, 431st District Court 
10 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site