Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00258-CR    
02-17-00258-CR
08/17/2017
Capital Murder
Christian Michael Tyrrell 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
03/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/07/2018Case ready to be set 
06/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/31/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/12/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/12/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/09/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/03/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/02/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/21/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/17/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tyrrell, Christian MichaelCriminal - AppellantPeter Smythe
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasSteven W. Conder
Joseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Elizabeth Beach 
1411740D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 1 
Life W/O Parole IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site