Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00257-CR    
02-17-00257-CR
08/16/2017
Poss of a Controlled Substance
David Neil Harper 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
03/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/22/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
07/06/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
06/28/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
06/22/2018Submitted 
06/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/01/2018Original exhibits filed 
05/31/2018Order entered 
04/02/2018Case ready to be set 
04/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/04/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/28/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
10/26/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
10/06/2017Notice of late record 
09/22/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/22/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/16/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/22/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasSteven W. Conder
Joseph W. Spence
Harper, David NeilCriminal - AppellantCharles James Gibson
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2 
Tarrant 
Honorable Wayne Francis Salvant 
1477941D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 2 
3 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site