Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00255-CR    
02-17-00255-CR
08/14/2017
Assault
Latricia Tyler 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
02/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/02/2018Case ready to be set 
03/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/23/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/21/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/22/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/17/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/17/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/25/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/14/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn E. Meskunas
Joseph W. Spence
Tyler, LatriciaCriminal - AppellantAbe Factor
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 2 
Tarrant 
Honorable Carey F. Walker 
1460191 
Court Reporter, County Criminal Court No. 2 
24 Months Probation, $750 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site