Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00254-CR    
02-17-00254-CR
08/09/2017
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Eric Jackson 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
03/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/04/2018Case ready to be set 
05/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/03/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/13/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/12/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/08/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/07/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
10/10/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/10/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
10/02/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/09/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/09/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJ. Zach Burt
Joseph W. Spence
Jackson, EricCriminal - AppellantDanielle A. Kennedy
Trial Court Information
297th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David C. Hagerman 
1490111D 
Court Reporter, 297th District Court 
Cts. 2, 3, 4 48 Yrs. each IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site