Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00253-CV    
02-17-00253-CV
08/01/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Eric Freeman and Eric Freeman & Companies, Inc. 
Charles Willis 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/12/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
12/11/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
10/23/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/03/2018Memorandum opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
01/30/2018Submitted 
01/12/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
01/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
01/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
12/14/2017Case ready to be set 
12/11/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/23/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/09/2017Notice of late brief 
09/13/2017Objection to mediation disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/2017Mediation objection filed 
08/31/2017Deadline for parties to select mediator 
08/30/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/29/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/25/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/15/2017Notice of late docketing statement 
08/01/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/02/2018StatusRelease to publisher
07/12/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Eric Freeman & Companies, Inc.AppellantJeffrey S. Lynch
Freeman, EricAppellantJeffrey S. Lynch
Willis, CharlesAppelleeDan Chern
Trial Court Information
442nd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Tiffany Haertling 
15-05860-442 
Court Reporter, 442nd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site