Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00251-CV    
02-17-00251-CV
07/28/2017
Estate Proceedings & Administration
In the Estate of Steven Douglas Nielsen, Deceased 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/13/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellee
02/14/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
12/27/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
10/26/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/22/2018Submitted 
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/13/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
02/14/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
01/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/25/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
12/29/2017Case ready to be set 
12/27/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/26/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/30/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/28/2017Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
08/09/2017Letter received 
08/08/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/28/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Footman, Maria JuanitaAppelleeKelly J. Curnutt
Logan Simmons
Nielsen, Linda D.AppellantDavid C. Bakutis
R. Dyann McCully
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No. 2 
Tarrant 
Honorable Brooke Allen 
2015-PR01535-2 
Court Reporter, Probate Court No. 2 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site