Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00250-CV    
02-17-00250-CV
07/28/2017
Injunction
Richard Chalker 
Nationstar Mortgage, LLC 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/23/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
02/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
12/08/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
02/23/2018Reply brief filed 
02/08/2018Case ready to be set 
02/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/08/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/08/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/04/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
11/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/03/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/04/2017No reporters record filed in civil case 
10/02/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/02/2017Clerks record due 
09/26/2017Motion for extension disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/22/2017Motion for extension filed 
09/12/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
09/11/2017Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
09/08/2017Telephone call received 
08/25/2017Objection to mediation disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/2017Letter received 
08/21/2017Mediation objection filed 
08/09/2017Deadline for parties to select mediator 
08/07/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
08/07/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/28/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Chalker, RichardAppellantMark Lieberman
Nationstar Mortgage, LLCAppelleeElizabeth Chandler
Jeffry B. Lewis
Trial Court Information
393rd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Douglas M. Robison 
15-04402-393 
Court Reporter, 393rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site