Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00246-CR    
02-17-00246-CR
08/03/2017
Sexual Assault
John Anthony Dobbs 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
01/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
04/27/2018Case ready to be set 
04/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/25/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/22/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/31/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
08/03/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/30/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasSteven Baker
Joseph W. Spence
Dobbs, John AnthonyCriminal - AppellantLisa Mullen
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3 
Tarrant 
Honorable Robb Catalano 
1452534D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 3 
75 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site