Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00245-CV    
02-17-00245-CV
07/24/2017
Arbitration
Mitchell Reitman and Melinda Reitman 
Roger L. Yandell 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/08/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
12/18/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
11/17/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/01/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
03/15/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
01/30/2018Submitted 
01/29/2018Appearance of counsel 
01/22/2018Letter received 
01/08/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
01/02/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
12/19/2017Case ready to be set 
12/18/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/17/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/27/2017No reporters record filed in civil case 
09/06/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
09/05/2017Order entered 
08/29/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/11/2017Deadline for parties to select mediator 
08/10/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/24/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/01/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Yandell, RogerAppelleeDaniel Price
Reitman, MitchellAppellantAndrea K. Bouressa
Bryan R. Haynes
Reitman, MelindaAppellantBryan R. Haynes
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Susan H. McCoy 
153-246953-10 
Court Reporter, 153rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site