Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00244-CR    
02-17-00244-CR
08/02/2017
Murder
Artur Sigalavillavicencio 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/29/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/22/2018Submitted 
06/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
01/30/2018Case ready to be set 
01/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/29/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/22/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/13/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/12/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/17/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/02/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
John E. Meskunas
Sigalavillavicencio, ArturCriminal - AppellantMike Berger
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4 
Tarrant 
Honorable Michael R. Thomas 
1451344D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 4 
50 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site