Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00241-CR    
02-17-00241-CR
07/28/2017
Assault
Ronnie Patrick Schindler 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
02/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/08/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
05/08/2018Objection disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/04/2018Objection filed 
05/02/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
05/02/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
04/09/2018Case ready to be set 
04/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/24/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/26/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/25/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/22/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/08/2017Order received from trial court 
08/07/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/28/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/30/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Schindler, Ronnie PatrickCriminal - AppellantRichard A. Henderson
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJacob Mitchell
Joseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 5 
Tarrant 
Honorable Jamie Graves Cummings 
1457109 
Court Reporter, County Criminal Court No. 5 
180 Days Tarrant County Jail 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site