Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00237-CR    
02-17-00237-CR
07/27/2017
Sexual Assault
Myron Jamal Nash 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
04/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/12/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/06/2018Case ready to be set 
05/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/17/2018Letter filed 
04/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/12/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/11/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/07/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/27/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nash, Myron JamalCriminal - AppellantJack V. Strickland
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Elizabeth Beach 
1482194D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 1 
10 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site