Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00232-CV    
02-17-00232-CV
07/11/2017
Personal Injury
Bonnie Gorman 
Arthanari Murali and Joan Murali 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/08/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
11/08/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/17/2018Submitted 
12/18/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
12/12/2017Case ready to be set 
12/08/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/08/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/02/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/07/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/01/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/14/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/14/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
07/11/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/17/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gorman, BonnieAppellantBrian W. Butcher
Murali, ArthanariAppellee 
Murali, JoanAppelleeStephen D. McKimmey
Trial Court Information
393rd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Douglas M. Robison 
16-02617-393 
Court Reporter, 393rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site