Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00231-CR    
02-17-00231-CR
07/21/2017
Aggravated Assault
Sergio Angel 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
01/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
09/18/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
08/30/2018Memorandum opinion issuedDismissed
07/30/2018Submitted 
07/30/2018Supplemental clerks record filed 
07/30/2018Case reinstated 
06/28/2018Order issuedAbated
06/22/2018Submitted 
06/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
01/26/2018Case ready to be set 
01/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/22/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
12/19/2017Motion to supplement record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/2017Motion to supplement record filed 
12/05/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/14/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
11/03/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/31/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/25/2017Motion to substitute attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/2017Motion to substitute attorney filed 
07/21/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/31/2018StatusPetition for discretionary review due in Court of Criminal Appeals
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Angel, SergioCriminal - AppellantAbe Factor
J. Zach Burt
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
297th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David C. Hagerman 
1446660D 
Court Reporter, 297th District Court 
12 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site