Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00226-CR    
02-17-00226-CR
07/19/2017
Sex Offenses
Antonio Parra Perez 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
03/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/26/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
06/13/2018Case ready to be set 
06/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/11/2018Corrected brief requested 
05/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/24/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/20/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/19/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/30/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/17/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/02/2017Appearance of counsel 
07/26/2017Order received from trial court 
07/19/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/11/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJennifer Ponder
Perez, Antonio ParraCriminal - AppellantJarret Noll
Trial Court Information
89th District Court 
Wichita 
Honorable Charles M. Barnard 
58,433-C 
Court Reporter, 89th District Court 
Ct. 1 & 5 - LIFE, Ct. 3, 4 & 6- 20 Yrs on each count. 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site