Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00225-CR    
02-17-00225-CR
07/17/2017
Aggravated Robbery
Christopher Gutierrez 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/05/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
07/05/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
06/22/2018Submitted 
06/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
01/17/2018Case ready to be set 
01/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/20/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/27/2017Notice of late record 
10/20/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/25/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/19/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
07/17/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/05/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasEdward L. Wilkinson
Joseph W. Spence
Gutierrez, ChristopherCriminal - AppellantColin McLaughlin
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3 
Tarrant 
Honorable Robb Catalano 
1473180D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 3 
15 Yrs TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site