Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00224-CR    
02-17-00224-CR
07/14/2017
Evading Arrest
David Keith Sauls Jr. 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
02/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/24/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
06/28/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
06/22/2018Submitted 
06/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/13/2018Case ready to be set 
03/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/25/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/24/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/03/2018Notice of late brief 
10/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/15/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/13/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/11/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/05/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/14/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/24/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sauls, Junior, David KeithCriminal - AppellantMarty Cannedy
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJennifer Ponder
Trial Court Information
78th District Court 
Wichita 
Honorable W. Bernard Fudge 
58,646-B 
Court Reporter, 78th District Court 
25 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site