Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00221-CR    
02-17-00221-CR
07/14/2017
Murder
Aspen Warren 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/21/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/01/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/02/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
12/21/2017Case ready to be set 
12/21/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/01/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/30/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/30/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/20/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/14/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/30/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasDebra A. Windsor
Steven W. Conder
Warren, AspenCriminal - AppellantJ. Warren St. John
Trial Court Information
396th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable George William Gallagher 
1443873D 
Court Reporter, 396th District Court 
Ct. 1 50 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site