Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00218-CR    
02-17-00218-CR
07/13/2017
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
Rosa Spears 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
05/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/13/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
09/11/2018Submitted 
06/22/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
06/19/2018Case ready to be set 
06/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/25/2018Notice of late brief 
12/14/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/15/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/14/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/06/2017Letter issued by the court 
11/02/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
10/13/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
09/11/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/13/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/29/2018StatusRelease to publisher
11/07/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Spears, RosaCriminal - AppellantMitchell Ryan Nolte
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCatherine Luft
Brendan Hyde
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 5 
Denton 
Honorable Coby Waddill 
CR-2016-06951-E 
Court Reporter, Denton County Criminal Court No. 5 
9 Months Probation $100 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site