Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00217-CR    
02-17-00217-CR
07/13/2017
Burglary of a Habitation
Armando Rios Jr. 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/06/2017Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/24/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
05/24/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/24/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/2018Submitted 
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
12/19/2017Case ready to be set 
12/19/2017Letter filed 
12/05/2017Response was not filed 
11/06/2017Letter filed 
11/06/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
11/06/2017Anders brief filed 
10/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/07/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/05/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/27/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/13/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/24/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rios, Junior, Armando Criminal - AppellantArmando Rios Junior
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
John E. Meskunas
Trial Court Information
371st District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Mollee Westfall 
1446091D 
Court Reporter, 371st District Court 
20 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site