Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00206-CR    
02-17-00206-CR
07/10/2017
Aggravated Kidnapping
Michael Donte Dunn 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/14/2018Case ready to be set 
06/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/12/2018Document filed 
04/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/29/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/27/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
10/27/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/27/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/27/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
07/24/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
07/24/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
07/20/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/10/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Shelby White
Dunn, Michael DonteCriminal - AppellantMike Berger
Trial Court Information
372nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David Scott Wisch 
1436656D 
Court Reporter, 372nd District Court 
Ct. 1 45 Yrs. Ct. 2 15 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site