Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00197-CR    
02-17-00197-CR
07/03/2017
Continuous Sexual Abuse of Young Child or Children
Bryan Keith Garrison 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
04/19/2018Amended brief filedAppellant
03/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/18/2018Submitted 
06/28/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
06/19/2018Case ready to be set 
06/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/19/2018Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/2018Amended brief filed 
04/17/2018Motion for leave filed 
04/03/2018Corrected brief requested 
03/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/21/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/27/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/27/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
10/20/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/11/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
07/10/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/03/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Garrison, Bryan KeithCriminal - AppellantBlake R. Burns
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Landon Wade
Trial Court Information
372nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David Scott Wisch 
1484494R 
Court Reporter, 372nd District Court 
50 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site