Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00195-CR    
02-17-00195-CR
06/30/2017
Theft Over $200,000
Charles Cody Lyon 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
02/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/15/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/08/2018Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
05/08/2018Waiver 
05/01/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
05/01/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
04/23/2018Case ready to be set 
04/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/15/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/06/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/02/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
08/01/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/01/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/13/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/30/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasEdward D. Lewallen
Don Schnebly
Lyon, Charles CodyCriminal - AppellantDavid A. Pearson, IV
Trial Court Information
415th District Court 
Parker 
Honorable Roy Graham Quisenberry 
CR13-0619 
Court Reporter, 415th District Court, Parker County 
30 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site