Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00194-CR    
02-17-00194-CR
06/26/2017
Aggravated Assault
Millicent Renee Wilson 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/30/2018Letter brief filedState
12/11/2017Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/04/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/31/2018Motion filed 
05/29/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
05/24/2018Order entered 
05/08/2018Document Received 
04/30/2018Case ready to be set 
04/30/2018Letter brief filed 
04/24/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/23/2018Letter issued by the court 
04/20/2018Motion filed 
04/09/2018Response filed 
02/06/2018Pro Se response to Anders brief 
01/30/2018Response filed 
01/24/2018Telephone call received 
01/08/2018Motion to access appellate record dispMotion or Writ Granted
01/02/2018Motion to access appellate record filed 
12/19/2017Letter filed 
12/11/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
12/11/2017Anders brief filed 
11/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/04/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/02/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/29/2017Docketing statement filed 
06/26/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
12/12/2017MotionMotion to withdraw as attorney
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Wilson, Millicent ReneeCriminal - AppellantKimberley S. Campbell
Millicent Renee Wilson
Trial Court Information
213th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Louis E. Sturns 
1416629D 
Court Reporter, 213th District Court 
Ct. 1 10 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site