Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00188-CR    
02-17-00188-CR
06/22/2017
Habeas Corpus
Ex parte Charles Barton 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
03/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/02/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
08/01/2018Letter filed 
07/30/2018Case ready to be set 
07/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/25/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/19/2017Letter issued by the court 
07/13/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/10/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/30/2017Docketing statement filed 
06/28/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/26/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
06/22/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Barton, CharlesCriminal - AppellantEdward Gail Jones
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasSteven Baker
Joseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 8 
Tarrant 
Honorable Charles L. Vanover 
1314404 
Court Reporter, County Criminal Court No. 8 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site