Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00178-CV    
02-17-00178-CV
05/19/2017
Protective Order
Yitzhak Wargocz 
Nicol Yonne Brewer 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/14/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
11/14/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
08/22/2018Submitted 
08/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
03/15/2018Case ready to be set 
03/14/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/14/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/21/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/20/2017Appearance of counsel 
07/17/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/07/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/21/2017Contest to an affidavit of inability to pay, filed in COA 
06/16/2017Docketing statement filed 
06/16/2017Appearance of counsel 
06/13/2017Notice of late docketing statement 
05/19/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/10/2018StatusRelease to publisher
12/20/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wargocz, YitzhakAppellantAnthony Hamilton Green
Jill L. Johnston
Brewer, Nicole YonneAppelleeKimberly Colliet Wesley
Marvina N. Robinson
Trial Court Information
360th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Patricia Bennett 
360-617423-17 
Court Reporter, 360th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site