Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00174-CR    
02-17-00174-CR
06/05/2017
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Rebecca Plumlee 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/21/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/21/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
12/22/2017Case ready to be set 
12/21/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/21/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/01/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/31/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/13/2017Docketing statement filed 
06/05/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCasey Polhemus
Plumlee, RebeccaCriminal - AppellantCarey Jensen
Trial Court Information
97th District Court 
Montague 
Honorable Jack A. McGaughey 
2016-0197M-CR 
Court Reporter, 97th District Court 
30 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site