Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00173-CV    
02-17-00173-CV
05/18/2017
Suit affecting parent child relationship
In the Interest of L.M., A Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/05/2017Brief was not filedAppellee
09/27/2017Appendix filedAppellant
09/21/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/15/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
12/05/2017Case ready to be set 
12/05/2017Brief was not filed 
11/10/2017Notice of late brief 
09/27/2017Appendix filed 
09/22/2017Corrected brief requested 
09/21/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/22/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
08/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/10/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/27/2017Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/2017Notice filed 
06/21/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
06/09/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/05/2017Docketing statement filed 
06/05/2017Appearance of counsel 
05/18/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/17/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
N., J. AppelleeJ. N.
M., L.AppellantTawanna Lynn Cesare
Mary H. Barkley
Lacy Kimball
Trial Court Information
415th District Court 
Parker 
Honorable Roy Graham Quisenberry 
CV16-0106 
Court Reporter, 415th District Court, Parker County 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site