Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00171-CR    
02-17-00171-CR
05/31/2017
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
Jonathan Ashley Butler 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/01/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
01/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/03/2018Exhibits filed 
04/02/2018Order entered 
03/28/2018Case ready to be set 
03/28/2018Supplemental clerks record filed 
03/28/2018Case reinstated 
03/07/2018Order issuedAbated
02/01/2018Case ready to be set 
02/01/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/20/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/12/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/08/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/21/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
06/13/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/31/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Butler, Jonathan AshleyCriminal - AppellantShelly Messerli
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Landon Wade
Trial Court Information
213th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Louis E. Sturns 
1445189D 
Court Reporter, 213th District Court 
12 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site