Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00169-CR    
02-17-00169-CR
05/31/2017
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Stephanie J. Tyler aka Stephanie J. Johnson 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/08/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
11/13/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
12/08/2017Case ready to be set 
12/08/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/13/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/26/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/28/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/18/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/18/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/18/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/30/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/31/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasAndrea Jacobs
Joseph W. Spence
Tyler, Stephanie J. aka Stephanie J. JohnsonCriminal - AppellantSteven Todd Jumes
Trial Court Information
432nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Ruben Gonzalez 
1447237D 
Court Reporter, 432nd District Court  
8 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site