Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00168-CR    
02-17-00168-CR
05/31/2017
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Jacab Austin Britt 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/08/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
08/22/2018Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
07/09/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
07/05/2018Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
06/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
05/24/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/2018Submitted 
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
02/08/2018Case ready to be set 
02/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/08/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/11/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/11/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/11/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/07/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/07/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/07/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/13/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/13/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/03/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/01/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/31/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/27/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Britt, Jacab AustinCriminal - AppellantBruce Anton
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn D. Warren
Eric Erlandson
Trial Court Information
235th District Court 
Cooke 
Honorable Janelle M. Haverkamp 
CR16-00091 
Court Reporter, 235th District Court 
40 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site