Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00164-CR    
02-17-00164-CR
05/25/2017
Aggravated Robbery
Emilio Sauceda Ramos 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/18/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/27/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/22/2018Submitted 
06/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
01/18/2018Case ready to be set 
01/18/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/27/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/10/2017Notice of late brief 
10/19/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/02/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/28/2017Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
09/25/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/25/2017Case reinstated 
09/07/2017Order issuedAbated
09/07/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/07/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/06/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
09/06/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
09/05/2017Telephone call received 
08/31/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/25/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ramos, Emilio SaucedaCriminal - AppellantSteven Todd Jumes
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
372nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David Scott Wisch 
1469252D 
Court Reporter, 372nd District Court 
10 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site