Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00158-CR    
02-17-00158-CR
05/19/2017
Evading Arrest
Andre Donovan Prescott 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/22/2018Brief was not filedState
01/22/2018Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
10/11/2018Case reinstated 
09/13/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/2018Order issuedAbated
08/30/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
08/21/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
08/13/2018Order entered 
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/22/2018Case ready to be set 
05/22/2018Brief was not filed 
04/04/2018Response was not filed 
03/23/2018Letter received 
03/07/2018Letter issued by the court 
03/05/2018Document filed 
02/05/2018Response requested by the court 
02/02/2018Letter filed 
01/22/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
01/22/2018Anders brief filed 
01/11/2018Notice of late brief 
11/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/25/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/27/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/26/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/19/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/15/2018StatusSupplemental clerks & court reporters record due
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJennifer Ponder
Prescott, Andre DonovanCriminal - AppellantRebekah R. Syck
Andre Donovan Prescott
Trial Court Information
30th District Court 
Wichita 
Honorable Robert P. Brotherton 
57,786-A 
Court Reporter, 30th District Court 
24 Months State Jail 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site