Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00156-CR    
02-17-00156-CR
05/18/2017
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
Hector Jimenez 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/14/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
08/03/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
08/14/2017Case ready to be set 
08/14/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/04/2017Letter received 
08/03/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/18/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/22/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/18/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/18/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jimenez, Hector Criminal - AppellantHector Jimenez
Carlton Hughes
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCatherine Luft
Andrea Simmons
Trial Court Information
362nd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Robert Bruce McFarling 
F16-1456-362 
Court Reporter, 362nd District Court 
16 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site